Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Driver's Licenses - Older Licensees - In-Person Renewal
Sponsored by
Senator Hettleman
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Failed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Motor Vehicle Administration from renewing the driver's license of an individual who is at least 85 years old without requiring the individual to complete the renewal transaction in person except under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0296
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/01/2020
Legislative Date
10/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Driver's Licenses - Older Licensees - In-Person Renewal
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {958171/1
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {958171/1
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Rejected (19-28)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/01/2020 10/01/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Driver's Licenses - Older Licensees - In-Person Renewal
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {958171/1 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Favorable with Amendments {958171/1 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Committee Amendment Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Favorable with Amendments Rejected (19-28) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:49 PM
Click to return on the top page