Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Home Builders - Performance Bond Requirement
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a person that constructs new homes for sale to the public to purchase a performance bond for the construction of each new home; requiring the liability under a performance bond to be for a period of 5 years after completion; prohibiting a home builder from beginning construction of a new home under certain circumstances; and altering the circumstances under which a building and permits department of a county may not issue a certain permit to include failure to purchase a performance bond.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2019
Legislative Date
10/30/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Business Regulation - Home Builders - Performance Bond Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2019 10/30/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Business Regulation - Home Builders - Performance Bond Requirement
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4.5-302.1, 4.5-601 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:48 PM