Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - 45th District - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 License
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 113
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to issue a Class B-D-7 license in the 5400 block of Harford Road in the 45th alcoholic beverages district if the applicant meets certain requirements.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0228
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0991 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2019
Legislative Date
11/01/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 113
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2019 11/01/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore City - 45th District - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 License
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - 45th District - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 License
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Economic Matters 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 113
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - 45th District - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 License
(   12-102, 12-1603 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:48 PM
Click to return on the top page