Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Open Meetings Act - Requirements for State Agencies and Local Boards of Elections (Maryland Transparency Act of 2021)
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring State agencies in the Executive Branch and local boards of elections to make publicly available on their websites an agenda and all meeting materials at least 48 hours in advance of each open meeting or, under certain circumstances, as far in advance of the meeting as practicable; requiring State agencies and local boards of elections to make publicly available on their websites live video or audio streaming of each portion of a certain meeting, and a certain recording for a minimum of 1 year after the date of the meeting; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0344
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/08/2020
Legislative Date
10/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/08/2020 10/08/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Open Meetings Act - Requirements for State Agencies and Local Boards of Elections (Maryland Transparency Act of 2021)
Senate 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 2:30 p.m.
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/12/2021 1:13 PM
Click to return on the top page