Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Body-Worn Cameras
Sponsored by
Senators Sydnor, Smith, Waldstreicher, Jackson, Carter, Hough, Lee, West, and Hettleman
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Racial and Equity Impact note – 2021 Maryland Police Reform Proposals
Synopsis
Providing that a knowing and willful failure of a certain police officer to activate a body-worn camera creates a rebuttable presumption that testimony of the police officer is inadmissible in a criminal prosecution relating to the incident that was not recorded; requiring certain law enforcement agencies to require the use of body-worn cameras by July 1, 2023, for each law enforcement officer that regularly interacts with the public; establishing the Task Force on Statewide Body-Camera Implementation; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {958677/1
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {958677/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Body-Worn Cameras
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Police Officers - Testimony - Presumption of Inadmissibility (Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {958677/1 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments {958677/1 Adopted 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Body-Worn Cameras
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Judiciary 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 2:11 PM
Click to return on the top page