Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator Patterson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Health, the Department of Housing and Community Development, and the Department of General Services, to adopt certain regulations on or before June 1, 2023, establishing uniform standards for mold assessment and remediation; requiring the Department of the Environment to maintain a certain registry and to develop and make available on its website and in print certain resource materials; requiring a certain indoor air quality report; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0129
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1067 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/13/2020
Legislative Date
10/13/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/13/2020 10/13/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
(   6-1701, 6-1702 )
(   8-211.2 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:49 PM
Click to return on the top page