Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Counties - Construction of Sidewalks and Crosswalks - Safe Alternative Routes to Public Schools
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a county board of education to prepare and post on the county's website each year a report that identifies certain information related to transportation services for certain public school students and certain safe alternative routes; requiring the governing body of a county to construct sidewalks and crosswalks necessary to create safe alternative routes for public school students who are ineligible for transportation services based on the distance between a residence and the school; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2019
Legislative Date
10/30/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 10/30/2019 10/30/2019 Pre-filed
Text - First - Counties - Construction of Sidewalks and Crosswalks - Safe Alternative Routes to Public Schools
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-801 )
(   12-506.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:48 PM