Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Human Services - Food Supplement Program - Renaming
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Human Services)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 508
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Renaming the food supplement program in the Department of Human Services to be the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program; providing that the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program is the successor of the food supplement program; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/17/2019
Legislative Date
9/17/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/19/2019
Legislative Date
12/19/2019
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of Human Services - Food Supplement Program - Renaming
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2020
Legislative Date
1/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2020
Legislative Date
1/03/2020
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
3 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
3 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Department of Human Services - Food Supplement Program - Renaming
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 508
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Department of Human Services - Food Supplement Program - Renaming
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/17/2019 9/17/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/19/2019 12/19/2019 Hearing 1/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Department of Human Services - Food Supplement Program - Renaming
Senate 1/03/2020 1/03/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/03/2020 1/03/2020 Hearing 1/09 at 1:45 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 3 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 3 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Human Services - Food Supplement Program - Renaming
Senate 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 5 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Referred Appropriations 6 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 508
Text - Chapter - Department of Human Services - Food Supplement Program - Renaming
(   5-501, 5-503 through 5-505 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:47 PM
Click to return on the top page