Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Child Pornography - Distribution, Creation, or Possession by Minor Subject
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain elements of the crimes of distribution or creation of child pornography and possession of child pornography to exclude from criminal liability a certain minor who is the subject of the pornographic matter.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/29/2019
Legislative Date
8/29/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/29/2019 8/29/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Child Pornography - Distribution, Creation, or Possession by Minor Subject
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-207, 11-208 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:47 PM