Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health – Mental and Emotional Disorders – Consent (Mental Health Access Initiative)
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the minimum age, from 16 years to 12 years, at which a minor has the same capacity as an adult to consent to consultation, diagnosis, and certain treatment of a mental or emotional disorder by a health care provider or clinic; and providing that a health care provider may decide to provide certain information to a certain parent, guardian, or custodian under certain provisions of law unless the health care provider believes that the disclosure will lead to harm to the minor or deter the minor from seeking care.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0132
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0782 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/24/2020
Legislative Date
9/24/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/12 (Senator Carozza) Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/17 (Senator Carozza) Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted (32-15)
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {383326/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (14-33)
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/13/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-16)
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/24/2020 9/24/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health – Mental and Emotional Disorders – Consent (Mental Health Access Initiative)
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Motion Special Order until 2/12 (Senator Carozza) Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Motion Special Order until 2/17 (Senator Carozza) Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Favorable Adopted (32-15) 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Floor Amendment {383326/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (14-33) 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Second Reading Passed 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health – Mental and Emotional Disorders – Consent (Mental Health Access Initiative)
Senate 2/19/2021 2/13/2021 Third Reading Passed (31-16) 14 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/24/2021 1:06 PM
Click to return on the top page