Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses - Requirements for Food Sales
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the holder of a manufacturer's license in each jurisdiction of the State to provide or conspicuously display a menu of food options or conspicuously display the actual food items available for purchase if the holder sells food for on-premises consumption; and applying the provisions of the Act to all jurisdictions without exception or variation.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/20/2019
Legislative Date
9/20/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/20/2019 9/20/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses - Requirements for Food Sales
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-401, 11-401, 12-401, 13-401, 14-401, 15-401, 16-401, 17-401, 18-401, 19-401, 20-401, 21-401, 2-219, 22-401, 23-401, 24-401, 25-401, 26-401, 27-401, 28-401, 29-401, 30-401, 31-401, 32-401, 33-401, 9-401 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:46 PM