Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Polling Sites – Firearms Prohibitions
Sponsored by
Senators Waldstreicher and Ferguson
Status
In the Senate - Laid Over (Senator Bailey) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from carrying or displaying a firearm on the premises of a privately or publicly owned building being used as a polling site during an election, including in a parking lot, or carrying or possessing a firearm within 100 feet of a polling site during an election, subject to a certain exception; and establishing a certain civil penalty of up to $5,000 for a certain violation.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0450
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/23/2020
Legislative Date
10/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law – Polling Sites – Firearms Prohibitions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {114131/1
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Bailey) Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/23/2020 10/23/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law – Polling Sites – Firearms Prohibitions
Senate 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {114131/1 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Bailey) Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/3/2021 11:57 AM
Click to return on the top page