Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employees - Collective Bargaining - Applicability, Bargaining Processes, and Memorandums of Understanding
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Chancellor of the University System of Maryland to act on behalf of the University System of Maryland and certain system institutions for the purpose of collective bargaining; altering the application of certain collective bargaining requirements to certain employees by requiring the State Labor Relations Board and the State Higher Education Labor Relations Board to make certain determinations; providing for the negotiation of a certain consolidated memorandum of understanding; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0486
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/03/2020
Legislative Date
10/03/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 10/03/2020 10/03/2020 Pre-filed
Text - First - State Employees - Collective Bargaining - Applicability, Bargaining Processes, and Memorandums of Understanding
Senate 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/9/2021 10:37 AM
Click to return on the top page