Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Environmental Service Reform Act of 2021
Sponsored by
Senators McCray, Benson, Carter, and Lam
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Removing the Director and Deputy Director of the Maryland Environmental Service from the Board of Directors of the Maryland Environmental Service; requiring the Secretary and the Treasurer of the Service to be selected by the Board from among the Board's members; prohibiting the Board from awarding a severance package under certain circumstances; requiring the Director to appoint a Diversity officer; requiring the Board, by December 1, 2021, to adopt or readopt certain policies consistent with the provisions of the Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0002
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/26/2020
Legislative Date
10/26/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Environmental Service Reform Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {959937/1 Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/26/2020 10/26/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Maryland Environmental Service Reform Act of 2021
Senate 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {959937/1 Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/26/2021 4:21 PM
Click to return on the top page