Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government – State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor and Unemployment Insurance Benefits (COVID–19 Public Health Emergency Protection Act of 2020)
Sponsored by
The Speaker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Governor to take certain actions as a result of the issuance by the Governor on March 5, 2020, of the proclamation declaring a state of emergency for the duration of a certain emergency; providing that a certain violation is subject to certain provisions of law under certain circumstances; providing that a certain alternative workweek may allow an employee to work certain hours or shifts; requiring that an employee authorized to work an alternative workweek is considered a full-time employee; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB1080
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (133-0)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (133-0)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {316586/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Cullison) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {116484/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Cullison) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {606981/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Cullison) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {183228/1 (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-3)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {327771/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-3)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
3/19/2020
Legislative Date
3/19/2020
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (133-0) 43A
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (133-0) 43A
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 43A
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Government - State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency - Authority of Governor (COVID-19 Public Health Emergency Protection Act of 2020)
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {316586/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Cullison) Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Floor Committee Amendment {116484/1 Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Cullison) Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Floor Committee Amendment {606981/1 Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Cullison) Adopted 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Floor Amendment {183228/1 (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - State Government – State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor and Unemployment Insurance Benefits (COVID–19 Public Health Emergency Protection Act of 2020)
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-3) 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Finance 51A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments {327771/1 Adopted 52A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Kelley) Adopted 52A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-3) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Government – State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor and Unemployment Insurance Benefits (COVID–19 Public Health Emergency Protection Act of 2020)
Post Passage 3/19/2020 3/19/2020 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14
Text - Chapter - State Government – State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor and Unemployment Insurance Benefits (COVID–19 Public Health Emergency Protection Act of 2020)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:44 PM