Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Bartlett, and Lehman
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain person to attach a copy of an order of the court establishing parentage to a certificate of birth under certain circumstances; requiring, for a birth involving a gestational carrier in which parentage is determined by a certain court, that certain information be entered on the certificate of birth and that the order of the court establishing parentage be attached to the certificate; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1062
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Judiciary) and Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Rereferred to Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled (Judiciary) and Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-208, 4-226 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:43 PM