Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Members of the Command Staff of the Police Department - Residency Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Wells
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City, beginning on or after January 1, 2022, to require certain members of the command staff of the Police Department of Baltimore City to reside in Baltimore City; requiring a certain local law, ordinance, or policy enacted or adopted by the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to include a certain waiver, exemption, or 120-day grace period to begin residence in Baltimore City under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0072
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {664264/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-5)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
50
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Baltimore City - Members of the Command Staff of the Police Department - Residency Requirements
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {664264/1 Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Members of the Command Staff of the Police Department - Residency Requirements
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (128-5) 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 50
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-1, 16-2A )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:40 PM