Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Green Career Gender and Minority Empowerment and Training Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Wells, Boyce, Bridges, and Smith
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to establish, subject to the availability of funds, the Green Career Gender and Minority Empowerment and Training Pilot Program on or before January 1, 2021, to encourage young women and minorities to pursue green careers; requiring the Mayor and City Council to take certain actions under the Program; authorizing the Mayor and City Council to coordinate with fiscal sponsors; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0849 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Baltimore City - Green Career Gender and Minority Empowerment and Training Pilot Program
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:39 PM
Click to return on the top page