Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health and Motor Vehicle Administration - Medical, Nursing, and Security Personnel
Sponsored by
Delegates P. Young, Acevero, Korman, Krimm, and Solomon
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the pay scale for a certain physician position in a certain facility to be the same as the pay scale for a certain psychiatrist position; requiring certain nursing positions to receive a certain upward adjustment in their pay scales when there is an upward adjustment to the pay scales for initial appointments to certain positions; requiring the pay scale for security attendants at a certain facility to be at least equal to the pay scale for correctional officers; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0639
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health and Motor Vehicle Administration - Medical, Nursing, and Security Personnel
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-103.4 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:38 PM