Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Access to Mental Health Care in Higher Education
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Carr, Charles, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Korman, Ruth, Terrasa, and Williams
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Access to Mental Health Care in Higher Education; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters; requiring the Task Force to submit an interim report on or before December 1, 2020, and a final report on or before December 1, 2021, to certain committees of the General Assembly; terminating the Act after May 31, 2022; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1015
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study Access to Mental Health Care in Higher Education
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Task Force to Study Access to Mental Health Care in Higher Education
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:37 PM