Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tidal Fish Licenses - Oyster Authorizations - Revocation
Sponsored by
Delegates Mautz, Anderton, Arikan, Buckel, Cox, Hornberger, Mangione, McComas, and Otto
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Department of Natural Resources from revoking an authorization to catch oysters unless the Department first holds a certain hearing; prohibiting a certain hearing from being held more than a certain number of days after a certain offense; authorizing, rather than requiring, the Department to revoke a person's authorization to catch oysters if the Department finds or concludes that the person has knowingly committed one of certain offenses; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tidal Fish Licenses - Oyster Authorizations - Revocation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Tidal Fish Licenses - Oyster Authorizations - Revocation
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:37 PM