Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup on Establishing a Science and Technology Best Practices and Innovation Network
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Qi, and Johnson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup on Establishing a Science and Technology Best Practices and Innovation Network; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Workgroup on Establishing a Science and Technology Best Practices and Innovation Network
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:36 PM