Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Home Builder Registration and Home Improvement Licenses - Professional Education Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Reilly, Arikan, Griffith, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a registered home builder and a registered sales representative to complete certain professional education requirements to qualify for renewal of a registration or a registration certificate; requiring the Home Builder and Home Builder Registration Unit to waive a certain requirement under certain circumstances; requiring a licensed contractor and a licensed salesperson to complete certain professional education requirements to qualify for renewal of a certain license; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Home Builder Registration and Home Improvement Licenses - Professional Education Requirements
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4.5-201, 4.5-305, 4.5-305.1, 8-101, 8-308, 8-308.2 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:35 PM