Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
School Bus Purchasing – Zero–Emission Vehicle – Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Barve, Charkoudian, Healey, Lierman, Luedtke, Moon, and Stein
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, beginning on October 1, 2023, that each school bus purchased by a county board of education be a zero-emission vehicle; requiring, beginning on October 1, 2026, that each school bus purchased by a certain person for use under a certain contract with a county board be a zero-emission vehicle; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - School Bus Purchasing – Zero–Emission Vehicle – Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - School Bus Purchasing – Zero–Emission Vehicle – Requirement
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-901 through 2-904 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:35 PM