Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Information Technology - Study of a Common Information Technology Platform for Health Occupations Boards
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, Arentz, Carr, Chisholm, Cox, Hornberger, Jacobs, Johnson, Kelly, Kipke, Malone, Mangione, Mautz, McComas, Morgan, Otto, and Reilly
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Information Technology to conduct a certain review of certain information technology platforms used by certain health occupations boards and make certain recommendations on the feasibility and cost of developing a certain common information technology platform; and requiring the Department to report certain findings and recommendations to the Senate Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee on or before December 1, 2020.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1045
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Department of Information Technology - Study of a Common Information Technology Platform for Health Occupations Boards
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Information Technology - Study of a Common Information Technology Platform for Health Occupations Boards
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page