Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Specialty Practice Pharmacy - Permit
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Board of Pharmacy to issue a permit for a pharmacy to operate as a specialty practice pharmacy; providing that a person that holds a permit to practice as a specialty practice pharmacy and that does not hold a pharmacy permit is only authorized to establish or operate a certain pharmacy; requiring that a separate pharmacy permit to operate as a specialty practice pharmacy is required for each pharmacy that a person establishes or operates; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Pharmacy - Specialty Practice Pharmacy - Permit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Pharmacy - Specialty Practice Pharmacy - Permit
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-401, 12-402, 12-403, 12-403.1, 12-407, 12-409 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:35 PM