Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Exemption - Spouses and Dependents of Disabled Veterans
Sponsored by
Delegate Cain
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Exempting a certain child or surviving spouse of a certain veteran of the United States armed forces from paying tuition at a public institution of higher education; providing the eligibility criteria for receiving the exemption; requiring the institutions to report to the Maryland Higher Education Commission each year; requiring the Commission to report to the General Assembly each year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Higher Education - Tuition Exemption - Spouses and Dependents of Disabled Veterans
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   15-106.11 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page