Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dialysis Patient Transportation Fund and Task Force to Study the Dialysis Patient Transportation Fund
Sponsored by
Delegate Krimm
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Dialysis Patient Transportation Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund; requiring the Secretary of Transportation to administer the Fund; requiring certain kidney dialysis centers to pay a certain fee for certain transports; establishing the Task Force to Study the Dialysis Patient Transportation Fund; terminating certain provisions of the Act after September 30, 2022; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020, October 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Dialysis Patient Transportation Fund and Task Force to Study the Dialysis Patient Transportation Fund
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-310.2 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:34 PM