Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Laurel PG 311-20
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 468
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the City of Laurel to participate in the Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0753
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 468
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Laurel PG 311-20
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49
Text - Third - Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Laurel PG 311-20
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 51A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 468
Text - Chapter - Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Laurel PG 311-20
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-801, 14-803 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:33 PM