Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Ethics – Financial Disclosure – Requirements (Conflicts of Interest Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Stewart, Acevero, Carr, Crutchfield, Ivey, Korman, Lopez, Palakovich Carr, Queen, Ruth, Shetty, Stein, and Terrasa
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to send a copy of a certain disclosure to the presiding officers of the General Assembly and the State Ethics Commission; requiring, beginning October 1, 2022, the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Attorney General, and Comptroller to establish a blind trust or divest certain assets or holdings for a certain purpose; prohibiting a certain individual from appointing certain individuals as trustee of a certain trust or receiving certain communications regarding the management of a certain trust; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Public Ethics – Financial Disclosure – Requirements (Conflicts of Interest Act)
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101, 5-501, 5-607, 5-608 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:33 PM