Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Acevero, Carr, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Feldmark, Fraser-Hidalgo, Korman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Love, McIntosh, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Reznik, Shetty, and Turner
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Analysis
Synopsis
Substituting the term "cannabis" for the term "marijuana" in certain provisions of law; altering a certain quantity threshold and establishing a certain age limit applicable to a certain civil offense of use or possession of cannabis; establishing an exception to the existing prohibition on obtaining or attempting to obtain a controlled dangerous substance or procuring or attempting to procure the administration of a controlled dangerous substance under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020, October 1, 2022
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
Text - First - Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   5-101, 5-601, 5-601.1, 5-601.2, 5-612, 5-614, 5-619, 5-620 )
(   13-3301 through 13-3316, 23-101 through 23-802 )
(   12.5-101, 12.5-102 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:33 PM