Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education - Legal Counsel and Chief Budget Analyst
Sponsored by
Delegates Boteler, Grammer, C. Jackson, Long, and Mangione
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Baltimore County Board of Education to employ legal counsel and a Chief Budget Analyst; providing for the terms of employment and salary of the legal counsel and Chief Budget Analyst; requiring the legal counsel to serve as the legal advisor to the County Board; requiring the Chief Budget Analyst to review the County Board's budget and approve or return the budget with suggested changes; requiring the Chief Budget Analyst to ensure that education spending is in accordance with the County Board's budget; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore County Board of Education - Legal Counsel and Chief Budget Analyst
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 1:56 PM