Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Transfer Tax - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsored by
Delegates Lisanti and Johnson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions of law requiring that the proceeds of the Harford County transfer tax be distributed to the county's agricultural land preservation program and to fund school site acquisition and school construction or certain indebtedness for school site acquisition and school construction; and authorizing the Harford County Council to determine, by law, the manner in which the proceeds of the Harford County transfer tax are distributed.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Harford County - Transfer Tax - Distribution of Proceeds
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Harford County - Transfer Tax - Distribution of Proceeds
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   123-51, 123-52 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:31 PM