Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Felony Second-Degree Assault
Sponsored by
Delegates Ghrist, Anderton, Arentz, Buckel, Hornberger, Jacobs, Krebs, Mautz, McComas, Morgan, Reilly, Rose, Saab, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from intentionally causing physical injury to another if the person knows or has reason to know that the other is a direct care assistant employed by the Maryland Department of Health engaged in the performance of the direct care assistant's official duties or a case worker or social worker employed by the Department of Human Services engaged in the performance of the case worker's or social worker's official duties; and applying certain penalties of imprisonment of up to 10 years or a fine of up to $5,000 or both.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Felony Second-Degree Assault
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Felony Second-Degree Assault
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-203 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:31 PM