Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Applicants for Employment - Race and Gender Information
Sponsored by
Delegates Washington and Ivey
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each county board of education to keep a record of the race and gender of all applicants for a position with the local school system and of any individuals who are hired for a position with the local school system, compile the information in a searchable and analyzable electronic format, and publish the information for the immediately preceding year on its website on or before February 1 each year, beginning in 2022.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools - Applicants for Employment - Race and Gender Information
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-124 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:31 PM