Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock
Sponsored by
Delegates Ciliberti, Arikan, Cox, Hartman, Krebs, Malone, Mautz, McComas, and Saab
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a court to prohibit a person convicted of a third or subsequent offense of driving under the influence of alcohol from operating a motor vehicle that is not equipped with an ignition interlock system and to order the person to install an ignition interlock system on the person's vehicle as a sentence, part of a sentence, or condition of probation; requiring a court to order certain motor vehicles to be impounded or immobilized for a certain period under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0943 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-404.1, 21-902.4, 21-902.5 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:29 PM