Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Acevero, Chang, Feldmark, Forbes, Haynes, Henson, M. Jackson, Krimm, Lehman, Lierman, McKay, Reznik, Solomon, and P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 457
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting reducing or terminating temporary cash assistance for certain individuals under certain circumstances; prohibiting reducing or terminating temporary cash assistance for certain individuals because of good cause as determined by the Secretary of Human Services; requiring local departments of social services to provide a conciliatory period of 30 days to certain individuals who are not in compliance with the Family Investment Program; requiring 25% of funding be withheld upon certain acts of noncompliance; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0787
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {364661/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-27)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Finance Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {197679/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-23)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 457
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {364661/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (102-27) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Finance Budget and Taxation 49
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {197679/1 Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (45-0) 51A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 51A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (111-23) 51A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 457
Text - Chapter - Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-308, 5-309, 5-310, 5-312 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:29 PM