Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Water Pollution Control - Discharge Permits - Industrial Poultry Operations
Sponsored by
Delegates Stewart, Acevero, Anderson, Bridges, Carr, Ebersole, Jalisi, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lopez, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Rosenberg, Ruth, Shetty, Smith, and Terrasa
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Department of the Environment from issuing certain discharge permits to a person for a new industrial poultry operation or for the purpose of extending or expanding an industrial poultry operation in operation on or before September 30, 2020.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0841
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Water Pollution Control - Discharge Permits - Industrial Poultry Operations
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-323, 9-323.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:29 PM