Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Abortions - Modifications
Sponsored by
Delegates Metzgar, Arikan, Chisholm, Cox, Grammer, Hartman, Krebs, Malone, McComas, Morgan, Parrott, Saab, Shoemaker, Szeliga, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain physicians from having a financial relationship with each other; repealing a provision of law providing that a physician is not liable for certain damages or subject to a certain penalty under certain circumstances; prohibiting a physician from performing or inducing or attempting to perform or induce an abortion before making a certain determination; requiring a physician to use a certain method for detecting a certain heartbeat; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Abortions - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Abortions - Modifications
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Age
(   20-207 through 20-209, 20-210 through 20-213 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page