Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Howard County - Fee for Rental Housing Services - Established Ho. Co. 15-21
Sponsored by
Howard County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a fee on rental housing licenses issued in Howard County to fund educational services for any tenant or landlord in need of assistance and legal services for any tenant with a household income of up to 60% of the median household income in Howard County; requiring that the fee be $15 per unit in fiscal year 2022; specifying that the fee is in addition to any other fees required for the issuance or renewal of a rental housing license; requiring a certain report; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-39)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Howard County - Fee for Rental Housing Services - Established Ho. Co. 15-21
House 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Howard County - Fee for Rental Housing Services - Established Ho. Co. 15-21
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (96-39) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/29/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2021 3/29/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/29/2021 3/29/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
(   14.906 )
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 12:37 PM
Click to return on the top page