Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Lounge License PG 312-20
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Class B-CL beer, wine, and liquor license providing for use at a cigar lounge in Prince George's County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue a Class B-CL license for use at a cigar lounge under certain circumstances; setting forth certain requirements for an applicant for the license; specifying that the license authorizes the holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor for on-premises consumption on certain days and during certain hours; establishing an annual license fee of $900; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Lounge License PG 312-20
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   26-1001.1, 26-102, 26-1604 )
(   24-504, 24-505 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:28 PM