Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturers - Direct Transfer Permit
Sponsored by
Delegates Hornberger, Anderton, Buckel, Cox, Krebs, McComas, and Otto
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a direct transfer alcoholic beverages permit; authorizing a local licensing board to issue the permit to the holder of a manufacturer's license; specifying that the permit authorizes the holder to sell or provide free samples of beer, wine, or liquor for on-premises consumption under certain circumstances; establishing that the sale of certain beer, wine, or liquor may not count toward certain limits on sales; establishing the hours for sale for the permit and an annual permit fee; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturers - Direct Transfer Permit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturers - Direct Transfer Permit
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:27 PM