Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Weapon Crimes - Assault Long Guns and Copycat Weapons
Sponsored by
The Speaker and Delegates Atterbeary and Luedtke
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "copycat weapon" applicable to certain criminal prohibitions relating to assault weapons; requiring a certain person who lawfully possessed a certain firearm before October 1, 2020, to register the firearm with the Department of State Police on or before January 1, 2021; providing that a person who lawfully possessed a certain firearm before a certain date and who voluntarily registers the firearm on or after a certain date and before a certain date is not subject to certain criminal penalties; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Weapon Crimes - Assault Long Guns and Copycat Weapons
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Weapon Crimes - Assault Long Guns and Copycat Weapons
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   4-301, 4-303 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page