Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Nursing Home Administrators - License Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Morgan, Charles, Chisholm, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, R. Lewis, Saab, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering certain training and experience requirements for certain nursing home administrator license applicants; requiring, rather than authorizing, the State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators to waive certain education requirements for certain individuals; and requiring the Board to waive certain examination requirements for an individual who was licensed, in good standing, and practiced as a nursing home administrator for at least 5 years in another state.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Nursing Home Administrators - License Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Nursing Home Administrators - License Requirements
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:26 PM
Click to return on the top page