Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retirees
Sponsored by
Delegates Boteler, Chisholm, Corderman, Cox, Grammer, Malone, McComas, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain retirees who began State service before July 1, 2011, to be eligible for prescription drug benefits in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program; specifying that prescription drug benefits shall be discontinued for certain Medicare-eligible retirees who began State service on or after July 1, 2011, and their Medicare-eligible spouses and dependent children; repealing the Maryland State Retiree Prescription Drug Coverage Program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retirees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retirees
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/9/2020 1:42 PM