Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public–Private Partnerships – Highway and Bridge Toll Facilities – Rates (No Lexus Lane Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Barve, Korman, and Stein
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a public-private partnership agreement for a project involving road, highway, or bridge assets from establishing or altering toll rates, a range of toll rates, a formula or algorithm to determine fluctuating toll rates, or any late payment fees unless approved by the Board of Public Works.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {220819/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-33)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
51A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Text - First - Public–Private Partnerships – Highway and Bridge Toll Facilities – Rates (No Lexus Lane Act)
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {220819/1 Adopted 49A
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49A
Text - Third - Public–Private Partnerships – Highway and Bridge Toll Facilities – Rates (No Lexus Lane Act)
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (96-33) 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 51A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:25 PM