Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools – Discrimination – Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins, Acevero, D. Barnes, Bartlett, Bridges, Cain, Carr, Charkoudian, Ebersole, Feldmark, Lopez, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, and Washington
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a county board, public or nonpublic prekindergarten programs, and public or nonpublic primary or secondary schools that receive State funds from discriminating against a person because of certain factors, refusing enrollment of, expelling, or withholding privileges from any student or prospective student because of certain factors, from taking a certain retaliatory action; providing certain penalties; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0993
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {395467/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-38)
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools – Discrimination – Prohibition
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {395467/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools – Discrimination – Prohibition
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (95-38) 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
(   2-303, 26-701 through 26-705, 26-702, 26-704, 4-108, 7-1A-04 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:24 PM
Click to return on the top page