Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - County Rental Property Licenses - Requirements and Limits
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each county to establish a program to license certain residential rental properties on or before September 30, 2021; authorizing a county to create certain exceptions to rental property license requirements; requiring each county to establish a limit on the number of rental property licenses that may be issued; prohibiting a county from issuing new rental property licenses after a certain limit has been reached, subject to an exception for certain property that has been in continuous operation as a rental property; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property - County Rental Property Licenses - Requirements and Limits
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-116 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:24 PM