Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Fees for Summer School Courses - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Smith, Acevero, Bridges, Charles, Ivey, R. Lewis, Lierman, Mosby, Wells, Williams, Turner, Cain, Wilkins, C. Branch, Hornberger, Luedtke, Rose, Washington, Kaiser, Patterson, D. Barnes, Palakovich Carr, Feldmark, and Ebersole
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a local school system from charging a student a fee for enrollment in a summer school course if the student attends a school in the local school system, credit for the course is a high school graduation requirement, and the student has previously taken the course, but did not successfully complete or receive credit for the course.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0966 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Fees for Summer School Courses - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {695161/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Schools - Fees for Summer School Courses - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools - Fees for Summer School Courses - Prohibition
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {695161/1 Adopted 45
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Public Schools - Fees for Summer School Courses - Prohibition
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 47A
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   7-211 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:24 PM