Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Psychiatric Hospitals - Units Licensed as Limited Private Inpatient Facilities - Billing
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each State or private psychiatric hospital that provides subacute care to patients in a unit within the hospital that is licensed as a limited private inpatient facility to provide patients receiving care in the unit with an itemized bill that is consistent with billing standards required by insurance carriers.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Psychiatric Hospitals - Units Licensed as Limited Private Inpatient Facilities - Billing
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:23 PM
Click to return on the top page